skip to content

Wright, Gary Allan

CPSO#: 97238

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 30 Jan 2012 to 16 Mar 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Electrophysiology

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Electrophysiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Electrophysiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jan 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2014