skip to content

Wright, Douglas

CPSO#: 88907

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Feb 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Fontbonne Building, Rm F506
50 Charlton Ave
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33312
Fax: 905-521-6068 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Wright Kenny-Scherber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wright ( CPSO# 88907 )
Dr. A. Kenny-Scherber ( CPSO# 88913 )

Business Address:
Crown Point Family Health Team
67 Kenilworth Avenue North
Lower Level
Hamilton ON  L8H 4R6
Phone Number: (905) 547-2302

Business Address:
40 Shellington Place
Suite 204
Second Floor
Brantford ON  N3S 0C5
Phone Number: 519 759-6116

Business Address:
St. Jospeh's Healthcare
Fontbonne Building, Rm F506
50 Charlton Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:02 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS WRIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WRIGHT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2013