skip to content

Wright, Alison Frances Catherine

CPSO#: 92840

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Nov 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Elmdale Family Health Organization
Unit 104
25 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 1H5
Phone: 226-210-3773
Fax: (519) 914-0122 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

1230 Talbot St
St Thomas ON  N5P 1G9
Canada
Phone: 519-631-9900 Ext. 1278
County: County of Elgin
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Alison Wright Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wright ( CPSO# 92840 )

Business Address:
104-25 Elm St
St Thomas ON  N5R 1H5
Phone Number: 226-210-3773

Business Address:
208-190 Wortley Road
London ON  N6C 4Y7
Phone Number: (519) 438-5101

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALISON FRANCES CATHERINE WRIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WRIGHT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2012