skip to content

Wortzman, David Jeffrey

CPSO#: 33303

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jun 1986
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1500
150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone: (416) 350-5900
Fax: (416) 350-5981 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Wortzman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wortzman ( CPSO# 33303 )

Business Address:
1500 - 150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 350-5900

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID JEFFREY WORTZMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WORTZMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Oct 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1986