skip to content

Worden-Rogers, Amanda Dawn

CPSO#: 96069

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: Lohnes, Amanda Dawn (used until: 27 Nov 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2014