skip to content

Wooster, Douglas Lawrence

CPSO#: 30786

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jun 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2983 Bloor St W
Toronto ON  M8X 1C1
Phone: (416) 516-4399
Fax: (416) 516-1704 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Canada Vein Clinics
9555 Yonge St
Suite 205
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M5
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 12 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS LAWRENCE WOOSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOOSTER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1979