skip to content

Woolnough, Rebecca Jane

CPSO#: 95994

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Glassford, Rebecca Jane (used until: 25 Sep 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Rolling Hills Dr
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone: 226-336-7229
Fax: 8449291554 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 Rolling Hills Dr.
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Canada
Phone: 519-941-2410
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rebecca Woolnough Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Woolnough ( CPSO# 95994 )
Dr. N. Woolnough ( CPSO# 101296)

Business Address:
265 Dundas Street
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9

Business Address:
Toronto Lung Care Clinic
Suite 204
110 Sheppard Avenue East
Willowdale ON  M2N 6Y8
Phone Number: (416) 229-2315

Business Address:
KidCrew Medical
1440 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3J3
Phone Number: (416) 654-5437

Business Address:
Citrus Medical
2240 Lakeshore Boulevard West
Unit 107
Toronto ON  M6K 3R1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. REBECCA JANE WOOLNOUGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOOLNOUGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015