Woolnough, Nicholas Rupert John (CPSO#: 101296)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jan 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Lung Care Clinic
204 - 110 Sheppard Ave E
Toronto ON  M2N 3A9
Phone: (416) 229-2315
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rebecca Woolnough Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Woolnough ( CPSO# 95994 )
Dr. N. Woolnough ( CPSO# 101296)

Business Address:
L&A General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Business Address:
Kingston Family Health Team
797 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G1
Phone Number: (613) 531-4234

Business Address:
Toronto Lung Care Clinic
Suite 204
110 Sheppard Avenue East
Willowdale ON  M2N 6Y8
Phone Number: (416) 229-2315

Business Address:
KidCrew Medical
1440 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3J3
Phone Number: (416) 654-5437

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 22 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS RUPERT JOHN WOOLNOUGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOOLNOUGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2019