skip to content

Woolfson, Jessica Pearl

CPSO#: 98174

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Apr 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Children's Hospital
London Health Science Centre
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 519-685-8177
Fax: 519-685-8105 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jessica P. Woolfson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Woolfson ( CPSO# 98174 )

Business Address:
The Children's Hospital
London Health Science Centre
Suite B1-162
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8177

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
McMaster Children's Hospital,Division of Pediatric Critical Care Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:03 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JESSICA PEARL WOOLFSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOOLFSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 21 Nov 2016 to 18 Dec 2016
EL - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2017