skip to content

Woolford, Bernard John

CPSO#: 20859

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact Dr. Woolford by email at: [email protected]
Date Received: 11 Oct 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:20 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 2016