skip to content

Woods, Donald Barry

CPSO#: 26513

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Jun 1974
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 124
2 Poyntz Street
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1M2
Phone: (705) 549-8270
Fax: (705) 549-8554 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Donald Woods Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Woods ( CPSO# 26513 )

Business Address:
Unit 124
2 Poyntz Street
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1M2
Phone Number: (705) 549-8270

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DONALD BARRY WOODS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOODS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2019