skip to content

Woodbury-Smith, Marc Ronald

CPSO#: 90237

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Feb 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dundee, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Woodbury-Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 29 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Feb 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jan 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017