Wood, Thomas (CPSO#: 97566)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
McMaster University
771 Concession Street
B3-136
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 72876
Fax: (605) 389-7942
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Thomas Wood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Wood ( CPSO# 97566 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
McMaster University
Room B3-136
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS WOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Jul 2018
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017