skip to content

Wood, Stephanie Anne

CPSO#: 88971

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Galen Eye Centre
27 Place d'Armes, Suite 100
Kingston ON  K7K6Z6
Phone: (613) 507-4800
Fax: (613) 507-4801 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
Phone: 613-544-3400 Ext. 2202
Fax: 613-549-8389
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Stephanie A. Wood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wood ( CPSO# 88971 )

Business Address:
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Business Address:
Galen Eye Centre
Suite 100
27 Place d'Armes
Kingston ON  K7K 6Z6
Phone Number: (613) 507-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE ANNE WOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2015