skip to content

Wood, Gavin Campbell Angus

CPSO#: 85269

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Apr 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Apr 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 4899 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

101-25 Mill St
Stone Mill Family Health Center
Gananoque ON  K7G 2L5
Canada
Phone: 6133823974
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gavin Wood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Wood ( CPSO# 85269 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:11 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GAVIN CAMPBELL ANGUS WOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Aug 2006
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Western University, 23 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2013