skip to content

Wood, Carine Henriette

CPSO#: 91627

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 01 Nov 2021
EXPIRY DATE
01 Nov 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Paris, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Carine H. Wood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 16 2022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 02 Jul 2009 to 11 Sep 2009
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 12 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2021