skip to content

Wonnacott, Matthew William Thomas

CPSO#: 90540

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101-200 Speers Blvd
Amherstview ON  K7N 0B6
Phone: (613) 634-1813
Fax: (613) 634-1253 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. Wonnacott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wonnacott ( CPSO# 90540 )

Business Address:
101 - 200 Speers Boulevard
Amherstview ON  K7N 0B6
Phone Number: (613) 634-1813

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MATTHEW WILLIAM THOMAS WONNACOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONNACOTT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011