skip to content

Wong-Chong, Nathalie

CPSO#: 95674

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jan 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University Of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Arts Building
581 Davis Drive
Suite 603
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 853-4448
Fax: (905) 853-7411 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Thornhill Endoscopy Clinic
390 Steeles Avenue West
Unit 11 & 12
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 882-6566
Fax: (905) 882-6567
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nathalie Wong-Chong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Wong-Chong ( CPSO# 95674 )

Business Address:
Medical Arts Building
Suite 611 & 603
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: (905) 853-4448

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Colorectal Surgery Effective:26 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NATHALIE WONG-CHONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG-CHONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2017