skip to content

Wong, Yuk-Shing

CPSO#: 25369

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Dec 1972

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 9-Nov-2017

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:Lingnan University, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Y. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 37 Dumfries Dr Markham ON L6C 1R9 Tel: 905-887-5022
Date Received: 22 Nov 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2017