skip to content

Wong, Tracy Tsui Ying

CPSO#: 89512

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 500
267 O'Connor St.
Ottawa ON  K2P 1V3
Phone: 613-232-3333
Fax: 613-232-4818 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: T.T.Y. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Wong ( CPSO# 89512 )

Business Address:
500 - 267 O'Connor Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1V3
Phone Number: (613) 760-3700

Business Address:
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6

Business Address:
7 St. Francis Memorial Drive
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TRACY TSUI YING WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010