skip to content

Wong, Sydney Sek Ning

CPSO#: 91371

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 502
3030 Lawrence Ave. East
Scarborough, Ontario
M1P2T7
Scarborough ON  M1P2T7
Phone: 4168400330
Fax: 4168400333 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sydney Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wong ( CPSO# 91371 )

Business Address:
502 - 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 840-0330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Vascular Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SYDNEY SEK NING WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015