skip to content

Wong, Philip Kar Fai

CPSO#: 94201

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Mar 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Mar 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Dept of Radio Oncologie
610 University Ave.
Toronto ON  M5G 2C1
Phone: (416) 946-4483 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Doctors Ma and Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ma ( CPSO# 93931 )
Dr. P. Wong ( CPSO# 94201 )

Business Address:
L122-2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5

Business Address:
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PHILIP KAR FAI WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2013