skip to content

Wong, Peter Nathenial

CPSO#: 28205

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Peter N. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 15 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: 20 Sunninghill Drive, Port Dover, ON, N0A 1N6
Instructions: Former patients should mail their requests
Date Received: 15 Jul 2016


Address: 20 Sunningham Drive, Port Dover, ON, N0A 1N0
Date Received: 26 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016