skip to content

Wong, Patrick Siu-Man

CPSO#: 31573

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 11-Jan-2014

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Patrick S.M. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 18 2011

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 01 Oct 2010

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011