skip to content

Wong, Keith Hoi-Kwun

CPSO#: 91157

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3292 Bayview Ave
Unit 105
North York ON  M2M 4J5
Phone: 4164454067 Ext. 1
Fax: 4164454069 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

24 Dalhousie St
Toronto ON  M5B 2A5
Canada
Phone: 1-888-878-3563
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K1E1
Canada
Phone: 416-756-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Keith Hoi-Kwun Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wong ( CPSO# 91157 )

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
Suite 105
3292 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 4J5
Phone Number: (416) 445-4067

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KEITH HOI-KWUN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2012