skip to content

Wong, Jay Siu Ming

CPSO#: 98012

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:Western University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 402
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone: (705) 728-8066 Ext. ext. 5
Fax: (705) 725-7330 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jay SM Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wong ( CPSO# 98012 )

Business Address:
11 Lakeside Terrace
Suite 402
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone Number: (705) 728-8066

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAY SIU MING WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017