skip to content

Wong, Helen Hoi Lam

CPSO#: 87520

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Surgical Centre
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1J 0C7
Phone: (905) 721-3281
Fax: (905) 721-6606 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health Ajax Pickering
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-2320 Ext. 14680
Fax: (905) 683-7669
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Helen H. L. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Wong ( CPSO# 87520 )

Business Address:
Taunton Surgical Centre
Lower Level
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1J 8P5
Phone Number: (905) 721-3281

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HELEN HOI LAM WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 06 Aug 2007 to 03 Sep 2007
EL - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Nov 2007 to 21 Dec 2007
EL - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2010