skip to content

Wong, George Kam Kwong

CPSO#: 27176

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jan 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2005

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Sydney, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2464 Howard Ave, Suite 201
Windsor ON  N8X3V6
Phone: (519)9776643
Fax: (519)9156326 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. George K. K. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Wong ( CPSO# 27176 )

Business Address:
Windsor Heart Institute
201-2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 977-6643

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GEORGE KAM KWONG WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jul 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2005