skip to content

Wong, Denise Wing-Yee

CPSO#: 93178

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Gateway Boulevard
Toronto ON  M3C 3A1
Phone: (416) 429-4991
Fax: (416) 422-3573 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 302
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Canada
Phone: (416) 585-9555
Fax: (416) 585-5815
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Denise W. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Wong ( CPSO# 28387 )
Dr. D. Wong ( CPSO# 93178 )

Business Address:
10 Gateway Boulevard
Toronto ON  M3C 3A1
Phone Number: (416) 429-4991

Business Address:
302 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 585-9555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DENISE WING-YEE WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012