skip to content

Wong, Daniel

CPSO#: 22458

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jun 1979
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Fukien, Mandarin, Taiwanese

Education: University of Manitoba, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
828 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1V3
Phone: (416) 603-9009
Fax: 4165940384 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 20 2022

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DANIEL WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1969
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 24 Nov 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1979

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 29 Jan 1980
Summary:

In January 1980, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Wong(s application for removal of restrictions from his licence.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 29 Jan 1980

 

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Nov 1977
Summary:

In November 1977, Dr. Wong pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, in that he made improper use of the authority to prescribe, sell or dispense a drug, including falsifying a record in respect of the prescription or sale of a drug, contrary to s. 26(25); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 26(31). The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and found Dr. Wong guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Wong(s licence to practice be revoked.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 08, 1977

Application for Reinstatement  
Decision Date: 09 Jan 1979
Decision: Application Accepted