skip to content

Wong, Catherine Chi-Fun

CPSO#: 98264

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2520 Harrison Ave
Masset BC  V0T1M0
Phone: (250) 626-4700
Fax: (250) 626-4709

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Catherine Chi-Fun Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 10 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:03 Jul 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CATHERINE CHI-FUN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2014