skip to content

Wong, Benedict

CPSO#: 98269

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone: 416-495-2701 Ext. 6874
Fax: 416-495-2426 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Benedict Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Wong ( CPSO# 98269 )

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2701

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BENEDICT WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017