skip to content

Wong, Ben Chun-Tung

CPSO#: 90516

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Sep 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone: (519) 941-2410 Ext. 2220
Fax: 226-916-0550 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: B.C. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Wong ( CPSO# 90516 )

Business Address:
Headwaters Health Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2410

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BEN CHUN-TUNG WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 2009 to 10 Jul 2009
EL - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2012 to 10 Feb 2012
EL - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2014