skip to content

Wong, Alexander Chung Hun

CPSO#: 85920

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 17 Mar 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective:27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Feb 2007 to 09 Mar 2007
EL - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Sep 2009 to 11 Oct 2009
EL - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 05 Apr 2010 to 02 May 2010
EL - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2012