skip to content

Wolski, Piotr Stefan

CPSO#: 94068

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 19 Apr 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Academy of Medicine, Lublin, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 24 Aug 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 25 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 19 Apr 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Apr 2013