skip to content

Wolkoff, David Andrew

CPSO#: 89688

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jul 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jul 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:State University of New York, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Wolkoff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wolkoff ( CPSO# 89688 )

Business Address:
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone Number: (519) 824-1010

Business Address:
Wilfrid Laurier University
Student Wellness Centre
75 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON  N2L 3C5
Phone Number: (519) 884-0710

Business Address:
University of Waterloo
Student Health Services
200 University Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2L 3G5
Phone Number: (519) 888-4567


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Arizona

USA - Hawaii

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Apr 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 2019