skip to content

Wolinska, Justyna Maria

CPSO#: 86929

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6402 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

4001 Leslie Str
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: 416 756 6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 242-1000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Wolinska Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wolinska ( CPSO# 86929 )

Business Address:
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6402

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective:30 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JUSTYNA MARIA WOLINSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLINSKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Pediatric General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Pediatric General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012