skip to content

Wolfish, Norman Morton

CPSO#: 18469

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Sep 1966

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Wolfish Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Wolfish ( CPSO# 18469 )
Dr. S. Aaron ( CPSO# 62311 )
Dr. K. Wolfish ( CPSO# 62475 )

Business Address:
7th Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9

Business Address:
Ottawa General Hospital
1812F - 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 739-6636

Business Address:
Health Services
University of Ottawa
Suite 200
100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa ON  K1N 1A2

Business Address:
80 Michael Cowpland
Kanata ON  K2M 2G9
Phone Number: (613) 599-3321

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:15 Sep 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Apr 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010