skip to content

Wolf, Amparo Myrelle

CPSO#: 98147

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 May 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 May 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 105
888 Regent street
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone: 705-806-2248
Fax: 705-806-2998 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Amparo Wolf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wolf ( CPSO# 98147 )

Business Address:
201-2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone Number: (705) 522-0292

Business Address:
888 Regent St
suite 105
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C6
Phone Number: 705-806-2248

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMPARO MYRELLE WOLF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2019