skip to content

Wolek, Ryan Richard

CPSO#: 100970

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St
2nd Floor, Room 421
Toronto ON, M5T 2S8
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 4166035641
Fax: (416) 603-5813 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ryan Wolek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Wolek ( CPSO# 100970)

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
60 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 603-2581

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RYAN RICHARD WOLEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017