skip to content

Wolder, Thomas

CPSO#: 28147

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Nov 2020
EXPIRY DATE
10 Nov 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 30 Jul 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Thomas Wolder Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 1 2021

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS - Record Storage and Retrieval Service 111 St Regis Crescent S Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 11 Jan 2021


Address: RSRS 111 St Regis Crescent S Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Phone: 1-888-563-3732.
Date Received: 11 Jan 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jul 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Nov 2020