skip to content

Wohlgelernter, Joseph Isaiah Ozer

CPSO#: 23625

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jun 1971
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Yiddish

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
441 Clark Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6W8
Phone: (905) 882-8103 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Joseph Wohlgelernter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wohlgelernter ( CPSO# 23625 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
441 Clark Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6W8
Phone Number: (905) 882-8103


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Israel

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOSEPH ISAIAH OZER WOHLGELERNTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOHLGELERNTER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1970
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1971