skip to content

Wlodek, George Kazimierz

CPSO#: 23300

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 10-Jan-2009

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:Queen's University, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1961 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1956
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1957
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004