skip to content

Witt, Samantha Bernice

CPSO#: 94922

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pivotal Kids Clinic
Unit 302
37 Jacob Keffer Parkway
Vaughan ON  L4K 5N8
Phone: (905) 303-4400
Fax: (905) 303-4700 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Children's Treatment Network
13175 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 0G6
Canada
Phone: 1-877-719-4795
Fax: 905-773-7090
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAMANTHA BERNICE WITT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WITT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 07 Apr 2011 to 04 May 2011
EL - Adolescent Medicine

University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2012 to 14 Nov 2012
EL - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2014