skip to content

Witt, Hans Adalbert

CPSO#: 19906

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Aug 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 19 Mar 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1966
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Apr 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006