skip to content

Witt, Alexandra Pearl

CPSO#: 88730

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Iglesias, Alexandra Pearl (used until: 05 Apr 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone: (705) 746-9321 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Witt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Witt ( CPSO# 88730 )
Dr. J. Witt ( CPSO# 95625 )

Business Address:
West Parry Sound Health Centre
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone Number: (705) 746-9321

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA PEARL WITT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WITT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Queen's University, 16 Nov 2010 to 30 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 31 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 07 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2012