skip to content

Witiw, Christopher Daniel

CPSO#: 97954

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 May 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 May 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Witiw, Christopher (used until: 27 Jan 2019 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Max Rady College of Medicine, University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
30 Bond St
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5060
Fax: (416) 864-3090 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Christopher D. Witiw Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Witiw ( CPSO# 97954 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER DANIEL WITIW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WITIW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 2019