skip to content

Witheford, Miranda

CPSO#: 98276

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jul 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Vascular Surgery
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Vascular Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MIRANDA WITHEFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WITHEFORD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 15 Apr 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Jan 2020
CF - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2021