skip to content

Wiss, Francois Rene

CPSO#: 17351

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jul 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Jul 2005

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Haiti, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 01 Jan 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 1959
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jan 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 2005