skip to content

Wisenberg, Gerald

CPSO#: 29736

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Dec 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MYHEALTH CENTRE
21589 RICHMOND STREET
Arva ON  N0M 1C0
Phone: (519) 672-0070
Fax: (519) 850-0144 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Canada
Phone: (519) 646-6100 Ext. 64076
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N5A 5A5
Canada
Phone: 519 672-0070
Fax: 519 850-0144
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

MyHealth Centre
Suite 301
1055 Fanshawe Park Road West
London ON  N6G 5B4
Canada
Phone: 519 672-0070
Fax: 519 850-0144
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gerald Wisenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Wisenberg ( CPSO# 29736 )

Business Address:
My Health Centre
21589 Richmond Street
Arva ON  N0M 1C0
Phone Number: (519) 672-0070

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 672-0070

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 01 Jan 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GERALD WISENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WISENBERG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1977